Oh, the things they forgot to mention to us in school....
The 15 Presidents before George Washington
There were 7 Presidents of Congress.
Peyton Randolph of Virginia (1723-1775)
9/5/1774 – 10/21/1774
5/10/1775 – 5/23/1775
Henry Middleton (1717-1784)
October 22, 1774 – May 10, 1775
John Hancock (1737-1793)
May 24 1775 to October 30 1777
Hancock was the presiding officer when the members approved the Declaration of Independence, which termed the famous signature since it was his duty to “put his John Hancock down first”.
Henry Laurens (1724-1792)
November 1, 1777. He served until December 9, 1778
John Jay (1745-1829)
December 10, 1778 to September 27, 1779
Samuel Huntington (1732-1796)
September 28, 1779 until ill health forced him to resign on July 9, 1781
Thomas McKean (1734-1817)
July 10, 1781 to November 4, 1782
There were 8 Presidents of the United States Under the Articles of Confederation.
John Hanson (1715-1783)
November 5, 1781 until November 3, 1782
Elias Boudinot (1741-1802)
November 4, 1782 until November 2, 1783
Thomas Mifflin (1744-1800)
November 3, 1783 to November 29, 1784
Richard Henry Lee (1732-1794)
November 30, 1784 to November 22, 1785
John Hancock (1737-1793)
November 23, 1785 - June 5, 1786
Nathaniel Gorham (1738-1796)
June 6, 1786 to February 1, 1787
Arthur St. Clair (1734-1818)
1787—and he served from February 2 of that year until January 21
Cyrus Griffin (1736-1796)
January 22, 1788 to April 30, 1789
George Washington’s inauguration was on April 30, 1789
The 15 Presidents before George Washington
There were 7 Presidents of Congress.
Peyton Randolph of Virginia (1723-1775)
9/5/1774 – 10/21/1774
5/10/1775 – 5/23/1775
Henry Middleton (1717-1784)
October 22, 1774 – May 10, 1775
John Hancock (1737-1793)
May 24 1775 to October 30 1777
Hancock was the presiding officer when the members approved the Declaration of Independence, which termed the famous signature since it was his duty to “put his John Hancock down first”.
Henry Laurens (1724-1792)
November 1, 1777. He served until December 9, 1778
John Jay (1745-1829)
December 10, 1778 to September 27, 1779
Samuel Huntington (1732-1796)
September 28, 1779 until ill health forced him to resign on July 9, 1781
Thomas McKean (1734-1817)
July 10, 1781 to November 4, 1782
There were 8 Presidents of the United States Under the Articles of Confederation.
John Hanson (1715-1783)
November 5, 1781 until November 3, 1782
Elias Boudinot (1741-1802)
November 4, 1782 until November 2, 1783
Thomas Mifflin (1744-1800)
November 3, 1783 to November 29, 1784
Richard Henry Lee (1732-1794)
November 30, 1784 to November 22, 1785
John Hancock (1737-1793)
November 23, 1785 - June 5, 1786
Nathaniel Gorham (1738-1796)
June 6, 1786 to February 1, 1787
Arthur St. Clair (1734-1818)
1787—and he served from February 2 of that year until January 21
Cyrus Griffin (1736-1796)
January 22, 1788 to April 30, 1789
George Washington’s inauguration was on April 30, 1789
Last edited: